Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean du Ploich

Deceased

Bishop of Arras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1555¹BornAire sur la Lyes
10 Sep 160146.6AppointedBishop of Arras, France
6 Jan 160247.0Ordained BishopBishop of Arras, France
1 Jul 160247.5DiedBishop of Arras, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean du Ploich:
Bishop Jean du Ploich (died ) Bishop of Arras

  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 99
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1602, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 11 Feb 2015