Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Michel d’Esne

Deceased

Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1539Born
15 Sep 159758.6AppointedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
7 Dec 159758.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
1 Oct 161475.7DiedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Louis Michel d’Esne (VIAF: 73804924)
Bishop Louis Michel d’Esne (born , died ) Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCambrai, Diocese of Cambrai, France
Ordained BishopS. Martin, Abbey, Tournai, Diocese of Tournai {Doornik}
Death PlaceTournai, Diocese of Tournai {Doornik}

  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 340
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 316
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1597, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 8 Dec 2017