Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pieter Damant

Deceased

Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1530¹Born
18 Jun 159060.4AppointedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
14 Oct 159060.7Ordained BishopBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
14 Sep 160979.7DiedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pieter Damant (VIAF: 296843724)
Bishop Pieter Damant (born 1530, died ) Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMalines
Ordained BishopGand, Diocese of Gent {Ghent, Gand}
Death PlaceGand, Diocese of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 201
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1590, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast