Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hendrik van Cuyck

Deceased

Bishop of Roermond, Netherlands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1546¹Born
25 Nov 159549.8AppointedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
8 Jul 159650.5Ordained BishopBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
7 Oct 160963.7DiedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hendrik van Cuyck (VIAF: 50135370)
Bishop Hendrik van Cuyck (born 1546, died ) Bishop of Roermond

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuylemberg
Ordained BishopS. Pierre, Church, Louvain
Death PlaceRoermond, Diocese of Roermond

  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 288
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1596, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast