Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Shi Hongchen (Shi Hongzhen), C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tianjin [Tientsin], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1928Born
1949²20.8EnteredMember of Congregation of the Mission
11 Aug 195729.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
11 Aug 198254.4Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Tianjin [Tientsin], China
26 May 199264.2AppointedBishop of Tianjin [Tientsin], China
3 Mar 200577.0DiedBishop of Tianjin [Tientsin], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Shi Hongchen (Shi Hongzhen)
Bishop Joseph Shi Hongchen (Shi Hongzhen) C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Tianjin [Tientsin]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWu Qing, Diocese of Tianjin [Tientsin]
Death PlaceTientsin, Diocese of Tianjin [Tientsin]

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,100
  • b/c2: Clandestine Episcopal Ordinations in China, Year 2018, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast