Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Clemens Scisman (Chichemanian)

Deceased

Bishop of Ancira (Angora) (Armenian), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1790¹Born
3 Aug 181323.5Ordained PriestPriest
30 Apr 185060.3AppointedBishop of Ancira (Angora) (Armenian), Turkey
7 Jul 185060.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ancira (Angora) (Armenian), Turkey
1863¹73.0DiedBishop of Ancira (Angora) (Armenian), Turkey

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Clemens Scisman (Chichemanian)
Bishop Antonio Clemens Scisman (Chichemanian) (born 1790, died 1863) Bishop of Ancira (Angora)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConstantinople
Ordained BishopCathedral, Istanbul, Archeparchy of Constantinople (Istanbul) (Armenian)

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,861
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 100
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,850, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast