Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Gregorio (Josip Grgur) Scotti

Deceased

Archbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1732Born
28 Dec 175523.7Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 178957.7AppointedBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
7 Feb 179057.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
24 Aug 180775.4AppointedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
1 Jan 181784.8DiedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Gregorio (Josip Grgur) Scotti (VIAF: 305674413)
Archbishop Giuseppe Gregorio (Josip Grgur) Scotti (born , died ) Archbishop of Zadar (Zara)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelvecchio (Kaštel Stari), Diocese of Trogir (Traù)
Ordained BishopSan Biagio della Giudecca, Church, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
Death PlaceZadar, Archdiocese of Zadar (Zara)
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Zadar, Archdiocese of Zadar (Zara)

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 219
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1790, Number 34
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 314
  • ob/c2+: AT, 9 Jan 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,657

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast