Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Asensio Sales

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1699Born
16 Dec 175455.5AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
13 Apr 175555.8Ordained BishopBishop of Barcelona, Spain
17 Jan 176666.6DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Asensio Sales
Bishop Asensio Sales (born , died ) Bishop of Barcelona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValence

  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,649
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 72, Number 352
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 14
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 116

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast