Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Caccia Dominioni

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}

Titular Bishop of Famagusta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1802BornMilan
20 May 182624.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Sep 185553.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
28 Sep 185553.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Danaba
2 Dec 185553.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Danaba
3 Aug 185755.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Famagusta
6 Oct 186664.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Caccia Dominioni:
Bishop Carlo Caccia Dominioni (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 40.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1861
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 239, and Page 267

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013