Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Sala, O.P. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China

Titular Bishop of Nilopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1775Born
1792¹16.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
14 Aug 181842.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China
14 Aug 181842.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
1 Oct 182044.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
1 Oct 182852.7DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tomás Sala
Bishop Tomás Sala O.P. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarcelona, Diocese of Barcelona, Spain
Ordained BishopKe-sen
Death PlaceKe-sen

  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 284
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 139, Number 750
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,820, Number 49
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 23 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast