Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Ramón Larumbre

Deceased

Bishop of Tudela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1738BornLumbier
25 Jun 178446.2AppointedBishop of Tudela, Spain
26 Sep 178446.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tudela, Spain
1 Sep 179658.4DiedBishop of Tudela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Ramón Larumbre:
Bishop Francisco Ramón Larumbre (born , died ) Bishop of Tudela

  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 101, Number 525
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1784, Number 28
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 420

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 3 Jan 2016