Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinando de Rojas (Roxas)

Deceased

Bishop of Vigevano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1650Born
1 Sep 167525.3Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 168332.9SelectedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
20 Dec 168333.6ConfirmedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
27 Dec 168333.6Ordained BishopBishop of Vigevano, Italy
30 Dec 168535.7DiedBishop of Vigevano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando de Rojas (Roxas)
Bishop Ferdinando de Rojas (Roxas) (born , died ) Bishop of Vigevano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuriel, Spain

  • a priest for 10.3 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 415
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 224, Number 1,390
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,683, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast