Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Kevin Rowell, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Aitape


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1927BornKorumburra, Australia
25 Jul 195426.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
15 Dec 196942.1AppointedBishop of Aitape, Papua New Guinea
24 Feb 197042.3Ordained BishopBishop of Aitape, Papua New Guinea
10 Oct 198659.0DiedBishop of Aitape, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for William Kevin Rowell:
Bishop William Kevin Rowell O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Aitape

  • a priest for 32.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013