Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Siméon-Stylite-François-Régis Rovère] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Vaucluse (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1756Born
29 Aug 179337.6SelectedBishop of [Vaucluse (Constitutional), France]
6 Oct 179337.7Ordained BishopBishop of [Vaucluse (Constitutional), France]
14 Feb 179438.0ResignedBishop of [Vaucluse (Constitutional), France]
4 Dec 181862.8DiedBishop Emeritus of [Vaucluse (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for Siméon-Stylite-François-Régis Rovère
Bishop Siméon-Stylite-François-Régis Rovère (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vaucluse

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBonnieux
Ordained BishopS. Symphorien des Carmes, Avignon, Diocese of Avignon
Death PlaceBonnieux

  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1793, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast