Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Rossi

Deceased

Archbishop of Ferrara, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1863Born
19 Jun 188622.5Ordained PriestPriest
9 Apr 191349.3AppointedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
3 Aug 191349.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
15 Dec 191955.9AppointedArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy
25 Jul 192965.6DiedArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Rossi
Archbishop Francesco Rossi (born , died ) Archbishop of Ferrara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThiene
Ordained BishopPerugia, Archdiocese of Perugia

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1913, Number 42
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 102
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,962

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast