Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Rooney

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}

Titular Bishop of Sergiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1844BornEdenderry, Ireland
25 Jun 186723.4Ordained PriestPriest of Dublin, Ireland
29 Jan 188642.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}, South Africa
29 Jan 188642.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Sergiopolis
19 Sep 188642.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sergiopolis
19 Feb 190864.1SucceededVicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}, South Africa
Dec 1924³80.8RetiredVicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}, South Africa
26 Feb 192783.1DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}, South Africa

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Rooney:
Bishop John Rooney (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}

  • a priest for 59.7 years
  • a bishop for 40.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 514

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013