Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Rondinelli

Deceased

Bishop of Comacchio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1717³BornFerrara
29 Sep 175033.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
11 Oct 175033.3Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 175841.4AppointedBishop of Comacchio, Italy
21 Jan 175941.6Ordained BishopBishop of Comacchio, Italy
24 Jul 179578.1DiedBishop of Comacchio, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Rondinelli:
Bishop Giovanni Rondinelli (born , died ) Bishop of Comacchio

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 36.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 174
  • ob: CB, 13 May 2013
  • c2: CB, 3 Jul 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,823
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Dec 2015