Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Luigi Gioviio, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ventimiglia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1719BornSarzana
30 Mar 174323.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
28 Sep 176747.8AppointedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
29 Sep 176747.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
6 Apr 177454.3DiedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Luigi Gioviio:
Bishop Angelo Luigi Gioviio O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Ventimiglia

  • a priest for 31.0 years
  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1770
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013