Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Pannilini

Deceased

Bishop of Chiusi e Pienza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1742³BornSiena
22 Dec 177027.9Ordained PriestPriest
13 Nov 177532.8AppointedBishop of Chiusi e Pienza, Italy
26 Nov 177532.9Ordained BishopBishop of Chiusi e Pienza, Italy
12 Aug 182380.6DiedBishop of Chiusi e Pienza, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Pannilini:
Bishop Giuseppe Pannilini (born , died ) Bishop of Chiusi e Pienza

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 47.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 171
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Dec 2015