Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diego Requeséns

Deceased

Bishop of Mazara del Vallo


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Sep 1637AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cartagine
25 Oct 1637Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Cartagine
7 Oct 1647AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
Mar 1650³DiedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Requeséns:
Archbishop Diego Requeséns , Bishop of Mazara del Vallo

  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 136, and Page 235
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1637, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 10 Mar 2015