Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Biagio Proto de Rossi

Deceased

Archbishop of Messina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1578¹Born
20 Jul 162648.5AppointedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
8 Nov 162648.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Messina, Italy
7 Apr 164668.2DiedArchbishop of Messina, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Biagio Proto de Rossi
Archbishop Biagio Proto de Rossi (born 1578, died ) Archbishop of Messina

EventPlace
Birth PlacePatti, Diocese of Patti
Ordained BishopSan Giovanni dei Fiorentini, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceMilazzo, Archdiocese of Messina
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Messina, Archdiocese of Messina

  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 239
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,888
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1626, Number 37
  • ob/c2/loc: AT, 6 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 11 Feb 2019

Quantcast