Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Corsetto

Deceased

Bishop of Cefal¨


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Jun 1638AppointedBishop of Cefal¨, Italy
24 Jun 1638Ordained BishopBishop of Cefal¨, Italy
23 Oct 1643³DiedBishop of Cefal¨, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Corsetto:
Bishop Pietro Corsetto (died ) Bishop of Cefal¨

  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 146
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 101, Number 612

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013