Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude-Antoine Duding, O.S.Io.Hieros. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lausanne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1681³BornRiaz
27 Feb 170624.3Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 171635.1AppointedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
29 Jun 171735.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
16 Jun 174563.6DiedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claude-Antoine Duding:
Bishop Claude-Antoine Duding O.S.Io.Hieros. (born , died ) Bishop of Lausanne

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1717, Number 10
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 239

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 26 Aug 2015