Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carolus Ludovicus Hugo, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1667BornVerdun
15 Dec 172861.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia
18 Sep 172961.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia
2 Aug 173971.8DiedTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia

MicroData Summary for Carolus Ludovicus Hugo:
Bishop Carolus Ludovicus Hugo O. Praem. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia

  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 324
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015