Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Passaponti

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Bologna

Titular Bishop of Epiphania in Cilicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1789BornBologna
18 Dec 181324.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Apr 184656.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy
16 Apr 184656.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Epiphania in Cilicia
24 May 184656.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Epiphania in Cilicia
15 Nov 186778.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Passaponti:
Bishop Giuseppe Passaponti (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bologna

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 188

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013