Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Plácido Sukias de Somal, C.M.V. †

Deceased

Abbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista di Venezia

Titular Archbishop of Siunia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1776²Born
14 Mar 182650.2AppointedAbbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista di Venezia
14 Mar 182650.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Siunia
23 May 182650.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Siunia
10 Feb 184670.1DiedAbbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista di Venezia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Plácido Sukias de Somal (VIAF: 89565083)
Archbishop Plácido Sukias de Somal C.M.V. (born 1776, died ) Abbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista di Venezia

  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 348
  • c2+: Google Books, 2012, 8, 25
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1826, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 13 Jun 2016