Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio María Pueyo de Val, C.M.F. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pasto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1864BornMonzón, Spain
22 Aug 188622.2Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
26 Nov 191753.4AppointedBishop of Pasto, Colombia
6 Jan 191853.5Ordained BishopBishop of Pasto, Colombia
9 Oct 192965.3DiedBishop of Pasto, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Antonio María Pueyo de Val:
Bishop Antonio María Pueyo de Val C.M.F. (born , died ) Bishop of Pasto

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015