Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Cristoforo Cardinal Numai, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Administrator of Alatri

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli


Events

DateEventTitle
1517AppointedAdministrator of Alatri, Italy
1 Jun 1517AppointedSuperior General of Order of Friars Minor
1 Jul 1517Elevated to Cardinal
6 Jul 1517InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana
10 Jul 1517AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
1518ResignedSuperior General of Order of Friars Minor
17 Apr 1523AppointedBishop of Isernia, Italy
5 Jul 1523Ordained BishopBishop of Isernia, Italy
19 Dec 1524ResignedBishop of Isernia, Italy
27 Apr 1526AppointedAdministrator of Riez, France
18 Mar 1527ResignedAdministrator of Riez, France
23 Mar 1528DiedAdministrator of Alatri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Cristoforo Numai:
Cristoforo Cardinal Numai O.F.M. (died ) Administrator of Alatri

  • a bishop for 4.7 years
  • a cardinal for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jul 1517
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 214
  • ob/c2+: CB, 6 Aug 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 7 Aug 2014