Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jérome Balbi

Deceased

Bishop of Gurk, Austria


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Feb 1523AppointedBishop of Gurk, Austria
25 Mar 1523Ordained BishopBishop of Gurk, Austria
25 Jun 1526DiedBishop of Gurk, Austria

MicroData Summary for Jérome Balbi
Bishop Jérome Balbi (died ) Bishop of Gurk

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 207
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1523, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 10 Jun 2018

Quantcast