Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Prat Pujoldevall, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Xiamen [Hsiamen, Amoy], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1873Born
10 Dec 188916.1ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
18 Sep 189723.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
27 Jan 191642.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Amoy, China
27 Jan 191642.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Mactaris
1 Oct 191642.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mactaris
11 Apr 194672.5AppointedBishop of Xiamen [Hsiamen, Amoy], China
6 Jan 194773.2DiedBishop of Xiamen [Hsiamen, Amoy], China

MicroData Summary for Manuel Prat Pujoldevall
Bishop Manuel Prat Pujoldevall O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Xiamen [Hsiamen, Amoy]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBatet, Spain

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast