Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wenzeslaus von Thun

Deceased

Bishop of Passau, Germany

Bishop of Gurk


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1629Born
1655²25.3Ordained PriestPriest of Passau, Germany
27 Mar 166434.6SelectedBishop of Passau, Germany
20 Apr 166434.6Ordained BishopBishop of Passau, Germany
12 Jan 166535.4ConfirmedBishop of Passau, Germany
10 Aug 166535.9SelectedBishop of Gurk, Austria
9 Nov 166536.2ConfirmedBishop of Gurk, Austria
6 Jan 167343.3DiedBishop of Passau, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wenzeslaus von Thun (VIAF: 30358336)
Bishop Wenzeslaus von Thun (born , died ) Bishop of Passau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTetschen
Ordained BishopSalzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg, Austria

  • a priest for 18.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 200, and Page 275
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 379
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1665, Number 32
  • ob/c2: CB, 4 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017