Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Scopelliti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Oppido Mamertina, Italy

Titular Bishop of Rhesaina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1841Born
24 Sep 187029.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Nov 189857.1AppointedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
8 Jan 189957.2Ordained BishopBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
15 Dec 191978.2ResignedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
15 Dec 191978.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhesaina
11 Apr 192179.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Oppido Mamertina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Scopelliti
Bishop Domenico Scopelliti (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Oppido Mamertina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCatona, Archdiocese of Reggio Calabria
Ordained BishopCathedral, Reggio Calabria, Archdiocese of Reggio Calabria

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 426
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,899, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 318

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast