Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe MorÓbito

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mileto, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Cyzicus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1858Born
11 Jun 188123.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Nov 189840.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Dioclea
15 Dec 189840.5AppointedBishop of Mileto, Italy
8 Jan 189940.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mileto, Italy
4 Jul 192264.0ResignedBishop of Mileto, Italy
4 Jul 192264.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cyzicus
3 Dec 192365.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Mileto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe MorÓbito (VIAF: 89287085)
Bishop Giuseppe MorÓbito (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mileto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArchi, Archdiocese of Reggio Calabria
Ordained BishopCathedral, Reggio Calabria, Archdiocese of Reggio Calabria

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 246, and Page 383
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,899, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast