Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Portelli

Deceased

Bishop of Lipari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1768¹Born
1792¹24.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lipari, Italy
8 Aug 183163.6SelectedBishop of Lipari, Italy
30 Sep 183163.7ConfirmedBishop of Lipari, Italy
27 Nov 183163.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lipari, Italy
28 Jan 183870.0DiedBishop of Lipari, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Portelli
Bishop Giovanni Portelli (born 1768, died ) Bishop of Lipari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLipari

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 241
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1831, Number 26
  • bd: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1837, Page 123
  • bd/c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast