Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tommaso Bonaventura della Gherardesca

Deceased

Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1654BornFirenze
19 Sep 168228.1Ordained PriestPriest
Dec 1697³43.3AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
1698²43.4ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
12 Feb 170348.5AppointedBishop of Fiesole, Italy
18 Feb 170348.5Ordained BishopBishop of Fiesole, Italy
12 Nov 170349.3AppointedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
21 Sep 172167.1DiedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Bonaventura della Gherardesca (VIAF: 68500541)
Archbishop Tommaso Bonaventura della Gherardesca (born , died ) Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 201, and Page 203
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 2
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 245

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Nov 2016