Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Piris Frígola

Bishop Emeritus of Lleida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1939 BornCullera
21 Sep 196323.9Ordained PriestPriest of Valencia, Spain
1 Mar 200161.4AppointedBishop of Menorca, Spain
28 Apr 200161.5Ordained BishopBishop of Menorca, Spain
16 Jul 200868.8AppointedBishop of Lleida, Spain
28 Jul 201575.8RetiredBishop of Lleida, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Piris Frígola (VIAF: 86946165)
Bishop Juan Piris Frígola (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Lleida

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lleida.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,967
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 8 Sep 2016