Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adamus Benedictus Ratkaj (Ratkay)

Deceased

Bishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1680³Born
27 May 170928.4SelectedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
26 Sep 171231.8ConfirmedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
26 Mar 171332.3Ordained BishopBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
18 Jul 171736.6DiedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adamus Benedictus Ratkaj (Ratkay)
Bishop Adamus Benedictus Ratkaj (Ratkay) (born , died ) Bishop of Senj (-Modruš)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBellecz, Diocese of Zagreb (Agram)
Ordained BishopMaison profès S.J., Wien
Death PlaceStenjevec

  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 350
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1712, Number 21
  • ob/c2+: CB, 28 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 30 Oct 2018

Quantcast