Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Joseph Supersaxo

Deceased

Bishop of Sion {Sitten}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1665³BornSion
24 May 168823.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
25 Jul 168823.4Ordained PriestPriest of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
2 Jun 170136.2SelectedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
12 Jun 170237.3ConfirmedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
1 Oct 170237.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
1 May 173469.2DiedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franz Joseph Supersaxo:
Bishop Franz Joseph Supersaxo (born , died ) Bishop of Sion {Sitten}

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 349
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 20 May 2015