Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gonzalo Bravo de Grajera

Deceased

Bishop of Coria, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1604¹Born
27 Jun 166561.4AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
May 1666³62.3Ordained BishopBishop of Palencia, Spain
28 Sep 167167.7AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
30 Aug 167268.6DiedBishop of Coria, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gonzalo Bravo de Grajera
Bishop Gonzalo Bravo de Grajera (born 1604, died ) Bishop of Coria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArroyo de San Serván

  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 152
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,509
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 201, Number 1,261
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 271
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1666, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast