Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Ros de Medrano

Deceased

Bishop of Orense


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1629¹BornAlcalá de Henares
29 May 167344.4AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
3 Sep 167344.7Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
24 Mar 169465.2DiedBishop of Orense, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Ros de Medrano:
Bishop Diego Ros de Medrano (died ) Bishop of Orense

  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 107
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 210, Number 1,314

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 30 Oct 2013