Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan de Isla

Deceased

Archbishop of Burgos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1630BornIsla
1661²30.6Ordained PriestPriest
8 Mar 167746.8AppointedBishop of Cádiz, Spain
May 1677³47.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cádiz, Spain
23 Sep 168050.4AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
16 Sep 170171.4DiedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Isla:
Archbishop Juan de Isla (born , died ) Archbishop of Burgos

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 130, and Page 207
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 215, Number 1,340
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1677, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015