Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Fernández del Campo Angulo y Velasco

Deceased

Bishop of Jaén


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1619BornBilbao
7 Jun 166646.6AppointedBishop of Tui, Spain
12 Sep 166646.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tui, Spain
3 Jun 166949.6AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
1 Jul 167151.7AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
23 Dec 168162.2DiedBishop of Jaén, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Fernández del Campo Angulo y Velasco:
Bishop Antonio Fernández del Campo Angulo y Velasco (born , died ) Bishop of Jaén

  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 151, and Page 210
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 201, Number 1,262
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 349
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1666, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 9 Apr 2015