Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Herrero Jaraba

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1620BornGuadalupe
8 Nov 167757.8AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
6 Mar 167858.1Ordained BishopBishop of Badajoz, Spain
17 Mar 168161.2AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
27 Apr 168161.3DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Herrero Jaraba:
Bishop Juan Herrero Jaraba (died ) Bishop of Plasencia

  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 301, and Page 316
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,512
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 217, Number 1,351

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015