Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lipót Perlaki Somogy

Deceased

Bishop of Szombathely


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1748³BornSzent-Márton
30 Mar 177122.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
30 Nov 177123.1Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jun 180657.6SelectedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
26 Aug 180657.8ConfirmedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
1 Nov 180658.0Ordained BishopBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
20 Feb 182273.3DiedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lipót Perlaki Somogy:
Bishop Lipót Perlaki Somogy (born , died ) Bishop of Szombathely

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 328

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013