Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Peris Mencheta

Deceased

Bishop of Coria, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1851Born
1876¹24.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 May 189443.1AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
12 Aug 189443.3Ordained BishopBishop of Coria, Spain
6 Jan 192068.7DiedBishop of Coria, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ramón Peris Mencheta
Bishop Ramón Peris Mencheta (born , died ) Bishop of Coria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValencia, Archdiocese of Valencia
Ordained BishopCathedral, Valencia, Archdiocese of Valencia

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 194
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017