Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco García y López

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Valencia

Titular Bishop of Loryma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1833BornNerpio
11 Apr 185723.9Ordained PriestPriest of Valencia, Spain
12 Nov 190370.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
12 Nov 190370.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Loryma
7 Feb 190470.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Loryma
30 May 190976.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco García y López:
Bishop Francisco García y López (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Valencia

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013