Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Ramón Ibarra y González

Deceased

Archbishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1853BornOlinalá
21 Feb 188026.3Ordained PriestPriest of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
30 Dec 188936.1AppointedBishop of Chilapa, Guerrero, México
5 Jan 189036.2Ordained BishopBishop of Chilapa, Guerrero, México
13 May 190248.5AppointedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
6 Jul 190248.7InstalledBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
9 Nov 190350.0AppointedArchbishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México
1 Feb 191763.2DiedArchbishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México

MicroData Summary for José Ramón Ibarra y González:
Archbishop José Ramón Ibarra y González (born , died ) Archbishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla

  • a priest for 36.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 202, and Page 557

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015