Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ippolito Franconi

Deceased

Bishop of Nocera de’ Pagani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1593¹BornAgnone
28 Oct 163138.8Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jan 163239.0AppointedBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
25 Jan 163239.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
1653¹60.0DiedBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ippolito Franconi:
Bishop Ippolito Franconi Bishop of Nocera de’ Pagani

  • a priest for 21.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 263
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 92, Number 548

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013