Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Pontano (Montano)

Deceased

Bishop of Oppido Mamertina


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Sep 1608Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jan 1632AppointedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
25 Jan 1632Ordained BishopBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
May 1662³DiedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Pontano (Montano):
Bishop Giovanni Battista Pontano (Montano) Bishop of Oppido Mamertina

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 264
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 92, Number 548

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013