Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomé Pascual Marroig

Deceased

Bishop of Menorca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1875BornPalma de Mallorca
26 Mar 189823.0Ordained PriestPriest
8 May 193661.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ibiza, Spain
8 May 193661.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Lappa
2 Oct 193863.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lappa
4 Mar 193963.9AppointedBishop of Menorca, Spain
18 Mar 196792.0DiedBishop of Menorca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomé Pascual Marroig:
Bishop Bartolomé Pascual Marroig (born , died ) Bishop of Menorca

  • a priest for 68.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015